CA AB607 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6364.7 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemptions: blood screening testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6364.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |