CA AB607 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11100, 11105, and 11450 of, and to add Section 18917 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public social services: disaster assistance services.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 607 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB607 Gloria By Wiener (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 607 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB607 Gloria By Wiener (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 607 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 3370.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2773.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 1911.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18917 | New Code | See Bill Text |