CA AB602 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4057, 4081, and 4301 of, and to add Sections 4025.2, 4084.1, and 4160.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Pharmacy: nonprescription diabetes test devices.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 602 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB602 Bonta Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 602 BONTA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB602 Bonta Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 602 BONTA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2565.). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1932.). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1788.). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1708.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Bonta. To Third Reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4025.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4057 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4084.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4160.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4301.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |