CA AB601 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 927, 927.1, and 927.2 of, to amend the heading of Article 10.2 (commencing with Section 927) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 1 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 927.3 of, and to add Section 12962.5 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurers: data reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code927Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17004Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback