CA AB601 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1569.2, 1569.15, 1569.16, 1569.50, 1569.58, and 1569.618 of, and to add Section 1569.356 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly: licensing and regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 601 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB601 Eggman By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 601 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB601 Eggman By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 601 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2870.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2404.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 1486.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.356 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.618 | Amended Code | Citation Text |