CA AB6 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2704.096 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Bonds: transportation: school facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and ED. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.096 | New Code | See Bill Text |