CA AB596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75125 of, and to add Section 75131 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to community planning.
Title
Community planning grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 75125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75131 | New Code | See Bill Text |