CA AB595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 79149.25 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: apprenticeship programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB595 Medina By Rubio (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 595 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 595 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2134.). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 916.) |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 79149.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |