CA AB595 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 66025.91 and 66025.95 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Community colleges: priority enrollment.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 595 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB595 Gomez By Block (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 595 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB595 Gomez By Block (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 595 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3298.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2357.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1453.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66025.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |