CA AB594 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 14 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Chapter 17.4 (commencing with Section 7286) of Division 7 of Title 1 of, and to add Section 7287 to, the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7286Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7287New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback