CA AB593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.
Title
Unemployment insurance: use of information: public workforce development programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 593 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - As (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB593 Carrillo By Morrell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 593 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - As (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB593 Carrillo By Morrell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 593 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3409.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2755.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1589.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |