CA AB587 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 22.8 (commencing with Section 22675) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to social media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social media companies: terms of service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 587 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2022-08-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
2022-08-02SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2022-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2022-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-07-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 1.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-19Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
2021-04-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1059.)
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22675New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback