CA AB587 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65852.26 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Accessory dwelling units: sale or separate conveyance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 587 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB587 Friedman et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 587 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB587 Friedman et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 587 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3379.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2778.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1357.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |