CA AB587 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 14977) of Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: pharmaceuticals: procurement: collaborative.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 587 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 587 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1957.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14977 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |