CA AB586 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17072 of, and to add and repeal Section 17208 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: deductions: qualified teacher: professional development expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 17). |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and ED. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17208 | New Code | See Bill Text |