CA AB585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 71361) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: Extreme Heat and Community Resilience Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 585 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2021-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1716.) (June 29).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20).
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71361New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback