CA AB58 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5080.40 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the state park system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State park system: operating agreements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2016-12-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
2016-12-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5002.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5080.40Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback