CA AB58 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 185024 and 185035 of, and to add Section 185032.1 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
High-speed rail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-02 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-17 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 185024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 185032.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 185035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |