CA AB577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 79505.5 of the Water Code, relating to disadvantaged communities.
Title
Disadvantaged communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 79505.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB577 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB577 |