CA AB574 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1286.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: smoking.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB574 Hill By Leno (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 574 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 574 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1973.) | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (June 29). | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 1543.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1286.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |