CA AB570 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4663 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: permanent disability apportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB570 Gonzalez Fletcher By Hueso (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 570 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 570 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2558.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1909.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |