CA AB57 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65964.1 to the Government Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: wireless telecommunication facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-27 - Assembly - AB 57 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB57 Quirk By Hueso (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 57 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-03AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 2604.).
2015-08-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2154.).
2015-08-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 15).
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-07-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 16).
2015-06-04SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1552.)
2015-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-05AssemblyRead first time.
2014-12-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
2014-12-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65964.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8886Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_57&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20141202_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150406_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150702_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150708_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150818_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20150831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_bill_20151009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150522_1012AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150616_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150715_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150824_0435PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_57_vote_20150827_0937AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback