CA AB57 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1276.45 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
University of California hospitals: staffing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB57 Price (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 57 PRICE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 57 PRICE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2066.) | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-26 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 25). | |
2009-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 1612.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time. | |
2008-12-05 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1276.45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |