CA AB568 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44965, 45193, 87766, and 88193 of the Education Code, relating to employees.
Title
School and community college employees: paid maternity leave.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 568 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB568 Gonzalez Fletcher By Mendoza (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 568 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB568 Gonzalez Fletcher By Mendoza (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 568 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 3121.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2531.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 1660.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |