CA AB565 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18941.15 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: live/work units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 565 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB565 Bloom By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 565 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB565 Bloom By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 565 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.) |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5975.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1384.) |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17958.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18941.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18941.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |