CA AB56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11019.7 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 2614 of, and to add Sections 320.4 and 1326.8 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Benefits: outgoing mail: claim processing: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 56 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB56 Salas et al. By Laird (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 56 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2021-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2021-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and INS.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11019.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1326.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code2614Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code320.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback