CA AB56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-28 - In committee: Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-28 - In committee: Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 26100) to Division 16 of the Public Resources Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: procurement by the California Alternative Energy and Advanced Transportation Financing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-28 - Senate - [08-28-2019] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 56 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 56 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 21. Page 2159.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1716.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 22). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26100 | New Code | See Bill Text |