CA AB56 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2016 (Chapter 23 of the Statutes of 2016) by reappropriating funds from Item 2240-101-6038 of the Budget Act of 2011 (Chapter 33 of the Statutes of 2011), relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2016.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 56 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 56 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 1583.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-12-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 2. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6254.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 14350 | New Code | See Bill Text |