CA AB558 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal, add, and repeal Section 17085 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation: retirement plan distributions: penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-09 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2011-05-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17085 | New Code | See Bill Text |