CA AB557 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11450 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11253.5 and 11265.8 of, and to add Sections 11495.16 and 11495.17 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: victims of abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 557 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB557 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 557 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB557 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 557 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3497.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From Special Consent Calendar. Ordered to unfinished business file. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2909.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1931.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11253.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11265.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11495.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11495.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11495.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11495.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |