CA AB556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25132 and 53069.4 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
County ordinances: violations: fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 556 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB556 Limón By Jackson (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 556 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB556 Limón By Jackson (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 556 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 3017.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2474.). |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 1793.) |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 25132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53069.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |