CA AB550 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-07 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-07 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44011.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Smog check: exemption: fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44011.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |