CA AB550 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 22 (commencing with Section 70000) to the Financial Code, relating to financial literacy.
Title
California Financial Literacy Initiative.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2009-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 70000 | New Code | See Bill Text |