CA AB55 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25536.7 of, and to add Section 25536.9 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Hazardous materials management: stationary sources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 55 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB55 Thurmond By Bradford (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 55 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB55 Thurmond By Bradford (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 55 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2911.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2346.). |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 1473.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 3). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25536.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25536.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 7872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |