CA AB549 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 32282.1 to the Education Code, relating to school safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive school safety plans: mental health professionals and police role on campus guidelines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 549 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB549 Jones-Sawyer By Liu (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 549 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2773.).
2013-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1983.).
2013-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1745.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2013-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2013-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32282Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32282.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code38000.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_549&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130314_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130423_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130506_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130711_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130815_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20130930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130501_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130529_0307PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130703_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130826_0207PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20130830_0956AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback