CA AB549 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 42461, 42463, 42474, and 42476 of, to add Section 42461.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 42479 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycling: electronic waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 549 CARTER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB549 Carter By Hancock (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 549 CARTER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-12 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
2012-08-29 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6527.).
2012-08-28 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4890.).
2012-08-24 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-23 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-06-26 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-25 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2012-05-31 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-05-30 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 14).
2012-05-02 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2012-03-13 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-06-02 Referred to Com. on E.Q.
2011-05-19 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-19 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
2011-05-16 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-05-12 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
2011-04-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-12 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2011-04-04 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-03-03 Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
2011-02-17 From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2011-02-16 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_549&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20110216_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120502_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120531_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120626_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120823_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20120925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20110411_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20110426_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20110511_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20110519_1013AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20120514_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20120828_1121AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20120829_0316PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback