CA AB549 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1209.1 and 1264 of, and to add Section 1264.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure: clinical laboratory personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 549 FURUTANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB549 Furutani By Negrete McLeod (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 549 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2010-09-08 Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2010-08-26 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 6727.)
2010-08-25 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2010-08-25 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4862.)
2010-08-23 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-08-20 Read third time, amended. To second reading.
2010-08-17 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2010-08-16 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
2010-08-02 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2010-07-15 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2010-07-01 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
2010-06-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2010-06-09 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2010-02-11 Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2010-01-28 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2010-01-27 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 3897.)
2010-01-26 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-01-25 Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2010-01-21 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (January 21).
2010-01-12 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 12).
2010-01-07 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2010-01-06 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2010-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-28 In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-04-22 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-21 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-15 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-04-14 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-13 Referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-02-26 From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
2009-02-25 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1209.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1264Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1264.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_549&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20090225_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20090414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20090421_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100104_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100106_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100125_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100617_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100715_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100802_amended_sen_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100817_amended_sen_v90.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100820_amended_sen_v89.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_bill_20100903_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100112_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100121_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100127_1137AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100628_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100802_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100812_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100825_1040AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_549_vote_20100826_1139AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback