CA AB543 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66027.4 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: student orientation: CalFresh.
Sponsors
Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 543 Davies Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB543 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 543 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB543 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 543 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2630.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2237.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1153.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66027.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |