CA AB540 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 131230) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 112 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting and tracking of violent deaths.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 540 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2013-08-12SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1745.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 23).
2013-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2013-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code131230New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_540&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20130429_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20130423_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20130529_0305PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20130626_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback