CA AB540 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 14184) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: alcohol and drug screening and brief

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 540 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB540 Beall By Alquist (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 540 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-29 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2012-09-12 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
2012-08-29 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6526.).
2012-08-28 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4887.).
2012-08-23 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-22 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2011-08-25 In committee: Held under submission.
2011-08-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-07-14 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-07 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-29 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-06-08 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2011-05-31 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1667.)
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-04 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-11 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-07 Read second time and amended.
2011-04-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2011-03-03 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2011-02-17 From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2011-02-16 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14184New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_540&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20110216_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20110407_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20110714_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20110815_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20120910_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20110405_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20110527_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20110531_0354PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20110706_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20110815_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20120828_1046AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20120829_0315PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback