CA AB539 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1524 of the Penal Code, relating to search warrants.
Title
Search warrants.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Assembly - AB 539 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Levine By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 539 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Levine By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 539 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2170.). |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1615.). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 968.) |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |