CA AB537 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1170.125 and 1192.7 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Serious felonies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1192.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |