CA AB536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 40266 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
Bay Area Air Quality Management Advisory Council: compensation.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB536 Wilson et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - AB 536 Wilson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Assembly - AB 536 Wilson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1575.). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 741.) |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 40266 | New Code | See Bill Text |