CA AB534 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4615 and 6658 of, and to add Sections 4620, 6660, and 8119 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: mechanics liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB534 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 534 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 534 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1612.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1270.) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4620 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 6658 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 6660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 8119 | New Code | See Bill Text |