CA AB530 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 3511 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: collective bargaining: peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 530 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB530 Cooper et al. By Mendoza (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 530 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB530 Cooper et al. By Mendoza (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 530 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-14 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3121.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2531.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 1998.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3511 | New Code | See Bill Text |