CA AB528 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7381 and 7382 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fishing.
Title
Fish and game: steelhead trout.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB528 Chesbro By Evans (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 528 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 528 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-18 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1966.). | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1733.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 7381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |