CA AB521 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14232 of, to add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 14230) to Title 12.2 of Part 4 of, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 14235) to Title 12.2 of Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: firearms: training.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 521 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB521 Berman et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 521 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB521 Berman et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 521 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 3297.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2695.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 1808.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 14230 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 14232 | Amended Code | Citation Text |