CA AB519 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 18730) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income tax: California Senior Citizen Advocacy Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 519 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB519 Levine et al. By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 519 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB519 Levine et al. By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 519 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3366.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2757.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1656.) |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18730 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |