CA AB516 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2333.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Safe routes to school.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Mike Eng [D] |
Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Assembly - AB 516 PEREZ, V.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB516 V. Manuel Pérez By DeSaulnier (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 516 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB516 V. Manuel Pérez By DeSaulnier (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 516 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 2493.). | |
2011-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1969.). | |
2011-07-14 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-13 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2011-06-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 1793.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 11). | |
2011-03-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2333.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |