CA AB511 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21417 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation.
Title
Aeronautics: meteorological towers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-09 - Assembly - AB 511 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB511 Yamada (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 511 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #15 AB511 Yamada (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 511 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5835.). | |
2012-08-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4320.). | |
2012-07-05 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-07-05 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-06-21 | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 21417 | New Code | See Bill Text |